MO SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits vehicle platooning on Missouri roads

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits vehicle platooning on Missouri roads

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-01-31SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 186-Hegeman
2018-12-19SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback