MO SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the issuance of certain incentives to businesses relocating from certain counties in Kansas
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the issuance of certain incentives to businesses relocating from certain counties in Kansas
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cierpiot [R] | Sen. Jason Holsman [D] | Sen. Lauren Arthur [D] | Sen. Shalonn Curls [D] |
Sen. John Rizzo [D] | Sen. Tony Luetkemeyer [R] | Rep. Jeff Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SB 182 SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 182 BILLS CARRYING REQUEST MESSAGE (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SB 182 General (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SB 182 SBs FOR THIRD READING-INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2019-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(0792S03.1SR) |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | H distributes CCR |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Cierpiot, Cunningham, Hough, Holsman, Curls |
2019-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Coleman (32), Bondon, Patterson, Washington, Ingle |
2019-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2019-04-29 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-04-25 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H aodpted |
2019-04-25 | House | HA 3 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Falkner)--(0792H02.07H) |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider HA 2 H adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider HCS, as amended H adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider Third Reading Vote H adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | House requests Senate return HCS SB 182, as amended - Motion to return bill to House S adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | HA 2 to HCS H adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Washington)--(0792H02.06H) |
2019-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order (Washington)--(0792H02.06H) |
2019-04-24 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Solon)--(0792H02.02H) |
2019-04-24 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(0792H02.01H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2019-04-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Economic Development |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Continued - Action postponed |
2019-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2019-03-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-02-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 182-Cierpiot, et al |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |