MO SB18 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to notify sellers if there is a change in sales tax law interpretation
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to notify sellers if there is a change in sales tax law interpretation
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means w/HCA 1 to HCA 1, HCA 1 as amended & HCA 2 |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means w/Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-03 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0147S03.01S) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-01-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0147S.03C) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 18-Kraus |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |