MO SB173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0973S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0973S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies state funding for small school districts
Title
Modifies state funding for small school districts
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0973S.02C) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 173-Romine |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=574312 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB173.pdf |