MO SB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to transportation and infrastructure
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to transportation and infrastructure
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Cierpiot [R] | Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-12 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-12 | CCR H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-11 | CCR S offered & adopted | |
2011-05-11 | H submits CCR | |
2011-05-05 | H conferees appointed: Cierpiot, Long, Smith-150, Fallert, Casey | |
2011-05-05 | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Stouffer, Rupp, Callahan, Justus | |
2011-05-05 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-04 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-04 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-04 | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schupp)--(1048L03.06H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(1048L03.01F) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(1048L03.09H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(1048L03.08H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lampe)--(1048L03.03H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(1048L03.05H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(1048L03.15H) | |
2011-05-04 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpoit)--(1048L03.13H) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected | |
2011-03-07 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-02 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-25 | S First Read--SB 173-Dixon and Kehoe |