MO SB17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Hearing Conducted H Pensions
Pending: House Pensions Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 8:00 am in House Hearing Room 7
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts any person retired and receiving a retirement allowance from PSRS and employed by a public community college from current law relating to retirement allowance restrictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts any person retired and receiving a retirement allowance from PSRS and employed by a public community college from current law relating to retirement allowance restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseHearing Conducted H Pensions
2019-02-11HouseReferred H Pensions
2019-02-11HouseH Second Read
2019-02-07HouseH First Read
2019-02-07SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted
2019-01-31SenateReported from S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent
2019-01-24SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted
2019-01-24SenateVoted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-01-23SenateHearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 17-Romine
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback