MO SB168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 168-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 168-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new requirements for contract bidding by school districts
Title
Creates new requirements for contract bidding by school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 168-Wallingford, with SCS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0620S.04C) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 168-Wallingford |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |