MO SB166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0881S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0881S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that certain records submitted to the Public Service Commission shall not be open to the public
Title
States that certain records submitted to the Public Service Commission shall not be open to the public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0881S.02C) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 166-Crawford |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=109467 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB166.pdf |