MO SB161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 161-Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 161-Cunningham
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to automation adjustments paid by employers subject to the unemployment compensation laws
Title
Modifies provisions relating to automation adjustments paid by employers subject to the unemployment compensation laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 161-Cunningham |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 161-Cunningham |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=51423 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB161.pdf |