MO SB16 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 16-Romine, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 3 & point of order (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to workforce development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to workforce development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 16-Romine, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 3 & point of order (pending)
2019-02-19SenatePoint of order (Rizzo) SA 3 goes beyond scope of bill - taken under advisement
2019-02-19SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(0715S04.17S)
2019-02-19SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered S defeated (May)--(0715S04.11S)
2019-02-19SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS. as amended S withdrawn
2019-02-19SenateSA 2 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Onder)--(0715S04.12S)
2019-02-19SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0715S04.09S)
2019-02-19SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0715S04.05S)
2019-02-19SenateSS for SCS S offered (Romine)--(0715S.04F)
2019-02-14SenateSCS Reported from S Education Committee
2019-02-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0715S.03C)
2019-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2019-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 16-Romine
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback