MO SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to unemployment benefits probationary periods
Title
Creates new provisions relating to unemployment benefits probationary periods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 157-Wallingford |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3931 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB157.pdf |