MO SB153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 153 & 117-Sifton, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 153 & 117-Sifton, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes roofing contractors in this state to register with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Title
Authorizes roofing contractors in this state to register with the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 153 & 117-Sifton, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee, with SCS |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 153 & 117) Professional Registration Committee (0750S.03C) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 153-Sifton |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |