MO SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-15HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2019-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-07HouseCommittee vote reconsidered
2019-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-15HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-09HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-03-27HouseH Second Read
2019-03-26HouseH First Read
2019-03-26SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2019-02-28SenateReported from S Progress and Development Committee - Consent
2019-02-28SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Progress and Development Committee - Consent vote adopted
2019-02-28SenateVoted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Vote Reconsidered
2019-02-26SenateVoted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee
2019-02-05SenateHearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
2019-01-24SenateSecond Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 152-Holsman
2018-12-03SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback