MO SB146 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 146-Romine |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |