MO SB145 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions of law relating to discriminatory practices
Title
Creates new provisions of law relating to discriminatory practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |