MO SB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Executive Session Continuted - Action postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Executive Session Continuted - Action postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Executive Session Continuted - Action postponed |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-03-27 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Burlison)--(0279S.04F) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 145-Burlison |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |