MO SB138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to work requirements for participants in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Title
Modifies the law relating to work requirements for participants in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee w/SCS |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee (0864S.02C) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |