MO SB130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 130-Kraus, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 130-Kraus, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to pay the taxpayers' attorneys' fees in income and sales and use tax cases when the taxpayer receives a favorable judgement
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to pay the taxpayers' attorneys' fees in income and sales and use tax cases when the taxpayer receives a favorable judgement
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 130-Kraus, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2017-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0034S.02C) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 130-Kraus |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |