MO SB13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0614S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0614S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes "Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome Awareness Month" in Missouri
Title
Establishes "Ehlers-Danlos Syndrome Awareness Month" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0614S.04C) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |