MO SB129 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child custody and child support enforcement
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child custody and child support enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Brattin [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SS SCS SB 129 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SS SCS SB 129 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House: SBs FOR THIRD READING - HCS SS SCS SB 129 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2023-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | HCS H adopted--(0992H.08C) |
2023-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Unsicker)--(0992H08.01H) |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2023-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-03 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2023-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2023-04-26 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-20 | House | H First Read |
2023-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2023-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2023-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0992S06.02S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Brattin)--(0992S.06F) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2023-03-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0992S.02C) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |