MO SB129 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0255S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0255S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the unlawful posting of certain information over the internet
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the unlawful posting of certain information over the internet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0255S.03C) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |