MO SB128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies various provisions regarding criminal offenses, the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, child support and custody, trusts and estates, guardianships, judges, court surcharges, court reporter fees, and victims of crime

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies various provisions regarding criminal offenses, the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, child support and custody, trusts and estates, guardianships, judges, court surcharges, court reporter fees, and victims of crime

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-14SenateVetoed by Governor
2017-05-22SenateDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned by House Speaker
2017-05-22SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2017-05-22SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2017-05-12SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2017-05-12SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2017-05-12SenateH adopts CCR
2017-05-12SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-05-12SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2017-05-11HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2017-05-11HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0528S05.1SR)
2017-05-11HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2017-05-11HouseH distributes CCR (0528S05.1SR)
2017-05-10HouseS conferees appointed: Dixon, Libla, Romine, Sifton, Chappelle-Nadal
2017-05-10HouseH conferees appointed: Roeber, McGaugh, Plocher, Mitten, Ellebracht
2017-05-10HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2017-05-10HouseS refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, & HA 4, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2017-05-10HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2017-05-10HouseHA 4, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Mitten)--(0528S03.21H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 4 H offered (Plocher)--(0528S03.13H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 3, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-10HouseHA 2 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0528S03.20H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Austin)--(0528S03.19H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 3 H offered (Barnes-60)--(0528S03.14H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (McCann-Beatty)--(0528S03.06H)
2017-05-10HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0528S03.15H)
2017-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-04-26HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-04-26HouseReported Do Pass H Judiciary
2017-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Judiciary
2017-04-18HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2017-04-11HouseReferred H Judiciary
2017-03-30HouseH Second Read
2017-03-29HouseH First Read
2017-03-28SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2017-03-28SenateSCS#2 S adopted
2017-03-15SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS#2 - Consent
2017-03-13SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted (0528S.03C)
2017-03-13SenateSCS#2 Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0528S.03C)
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Vote Reconsidered
2017-03-07SenateUnanimous consent to return to S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Adopted
2017-03-01SenateMotion to adopt SCS S withdrawn
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS - Consent
2017-02-06SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted (0528S.02C)
2017-02-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0528S.02C)
2017-02-06SenateCommittee Vote Reconsidered
2017-01-23SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted
2017-01-23SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-17SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 128-Dixon
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095391
Texthttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB128.pdf
Texthttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/comm/SB128.pdf
Texthttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/perf/SB128.pdf
Texthttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/tat/SB128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/Journals/RDay440328567-583.pdf#574
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/071.025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/071.024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/071.023.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/073.060.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/073.061.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/073.059.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback