MO SB128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions regarding criminal offenses, the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, child support and custody, trusts and estates, guardianships, judges, court surcharges, court reporter fees, and victims of crime
Title
Modifies various provisions regarding criminal offenses, the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, child support and custody, trusts and estates, guardianships, judges, court surcharges, court reporter fees, and victims of crime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 128 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 (HA 4, A.A.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 128 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0528S05.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0528S05.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Libla, Romine, Sifton, Chappelle-Nadal |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Roeber, McGaugh, Plocher, Mitten, Ellebracht |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended, & HA 4, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Mitten)--(0528S03.21H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 4 H offered (Plocher)--(0528S03.13H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 3, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0528S03.20H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Austin)--(0528S03.19H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 3 H offered (Barnes-60)--(0528S03.14H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (McCann-Beatty)--(0528S03.06H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0528S03.15H) |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2017-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-28 | Senate | SCS#2 S adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS#2 - Consent |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted (0528S.03C) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | SCS#2 Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0528S.03C) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Unanimous consent to return to S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Motion to adopt SCS S withdrawn |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted (0528S.02C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0528S.02C) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 128-Dixon |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |