MO SB127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to conduct a study regarding the importation of certain prescription drugs by the state
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to conduct a study regarding the importation of certain prescription drugs by the state
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 127-Sater |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=122 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB127.pdf |