MO SB125 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies duties of boards of education
Title
Modifies duties of boards of education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-15 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-15 | House | S concurs in HA 1, as amended |
2013-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Stream)--(0665S04.16H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (McCann Beatty)--(0665S04.20H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HA 1 H offered (Barnes)--(0665S04.11H) |
2013-05-08 | House | Laid over |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H defeated |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Funderburk)--(0665L06.11H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(0665L06.65H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(0665L06.76H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HSA 1 for HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(0665L06.78H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Webb)--(0665L06.56H) |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider H Fiscal Review Committee Vote - Adopted |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-25 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0665S04.05S) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(0665S.04F) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0665S.03C) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 125-Nasheed |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled |