MO SB1240 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Organized Retail Crime Task Force
Title
Establishes the Organized Retail Crime Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S First Read |