MO SB121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to liquor control laws
Title
Modifies provisions relating to liquor control laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(0828S08.03S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0828S08.02S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schaefer)--(0828S.08F) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (0828S.06C) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 121-Schaefer |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled |