MO SB12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Defeated on Perfection Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Defeated on Perfection Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public health
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Defeated on Perfection Vote |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0738S.13F) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(0738S09.21S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0738S09.01F) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(0738S09.19S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Hegeman)--(0738S09.15S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Razer)--(0738S09.10S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Roberts)--(0738S09.14S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Onder)--(0738S.09F) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2021-02-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 12, 20, 21, 31, 56, 67 & 68) Health and Pensions Committee (0738S.06C) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |