MO SB12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2015-03-19 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(0110H08.09H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee w/HCAs 1, 2 & 3 |
2015-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee w/HCAs 1, 2 & 3 |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-02 | House | H First Read |
2015-01-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Corrected Journal entry: Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-01-26 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(0110S07.03S) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0110S07.01S) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Munzlinger)--(0110S.07F) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-01-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (0110S.05C) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 12-Munzlinger |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |