MO SB1179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Missouri Rx Plan to August 28, 2029
Title
Extends the Missouri Rx Plan to August 28, 2029
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | S First Read |