MO SB1173 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires members of the General Assembly to file certain reports with the Missouri Ethics Commission
Title
Requires members of the General Assembly to file certain reports with the Missouri Ethics Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |