MO SB1162 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate 70 Missouri River Bridge in Boone County and Cooper County slated for completion in 2024 as the "Senator Roy D. Blunt Bridge"
Title
Designates the new Interstate 70 Missouri River Bridge in Boone County and Cooper County slated for completion in 2024 as the "Senator Roy D. Blunt Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | S First Read |