MO SB1134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to self-defense
Title
Modifies provisions relating to self-defense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | S First Read |