MO SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] | Rep. Nate Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 112 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 112 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 112 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 121 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 112 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 112 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 112 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 121 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 112 (*HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: SB 112 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR#2 |
2017-05-12 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0169S09.1SR) |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR#2 (0169S09.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | S conferees appointed: Schatz, Hegeman, Hoskins, Curls, Holsman |
2017-05-11 | House | H conferees re-appointed: Tate, Fraker, Bondon, Adams, McCreery |
2017-05-11 | House | H grants further conference |
2017-05-11 | House | S requests further conference |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR (0169S07.1SR) |
2017-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Schatz, Hegeman, Hoskins, Curls, Holsman |
2017-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Tate, Fraker, Bondon, Adams, McCreery |
2017-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2017-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walker)--(0169H05.17H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wessels)--(0169H05.24H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCreery)--(0169H05.42H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Spencer)--(0169H05.12H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Brattin)--(0169H05.33H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Justus)--(0169H05.30H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(0169H05.27H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(0169H05.25H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Kolkmeyer)--(0169H05.37H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Trent)--(0169H05.21H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(0169H05.07H) |
2017-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Corlew)--(0169H05.29H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-16 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted (0169S.02C) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0169S.02C) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 112-Schatz |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |