MO SB112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SB 112-Rupp and Richard, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede & take up and pass bill)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SB 112-Rupp and Richard, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede & take up and pass bill)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax incentives
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax incentives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SB 112-Rupp and Richard, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede & take up and pass bill) |
2013-05-17 | House | S requests H recede & take up and pass bill |
2013-05-17 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended (Rupp) withdrawn |
2013-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(0461H05.34H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(0461H05.37H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bahr)--(0461H05.32H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0461H05.31H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-110)--(0461H05.19H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(0461H05.30H) |
2013-05-16 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(0461H05.36H) |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & defeated (Schaefer)--(0461S02.04S) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0461S03.08S) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S defeated |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Justus)--(8052S13.02S) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | SS S offered (Rupp)--(0461S.03F) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 112-Rupp and Richard |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled |