MO SB111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health carriers to provide Internet access to its standard fee schedules and prohibits carriers from refusing to contract with providers willing to meet certain provider participation terms and conditions
Title
Requires health carriers to provide Internet access to its standard fee schedules and prohibits carriers from refusing to contract with providers willing to meet certain provider participation terms and conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing to be Continued S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-13 | S First Read--SB 111-Schaaf |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4075535 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB111.pdf |