MO SB1102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1102-Kehoe, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1102-Kehoe, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to civil procedure, tort claims, contingency fee contracts entered into by the state, unlawful merchandising practices, arbitration agreements between employers and employees, damages, and products liability
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to civil procedure, tort claims, contingency fee contracts entered into by the state, unlawful merchandising practices, arbitration agreements between employers and employees, damages, and products liability
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1102-Kehoe, with SCS |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2018-04-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (6804S.05C) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1102-Kehoe |