MO SB11 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Beck)--(0467S07.16S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | SS S offered (Schatz)--(0467S.07F) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |