MO SB11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 11-McKenna (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 11-McKenna (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various regulations governing the operation of motor vehicles
Title
Modifies various regulations governing the operation of motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 11-McKenna (In Fiscal Oversight) | |
2011-04-07 | Voted Do Not Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Perfected | |
2011-02-01 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-02-01 | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(0338S02.01S) | |
2011-02-01 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Lembke)--(0338S02.04S) | |
2011-01-27 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-01-26 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee (0338S.02C) | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 11-McKenna | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |