MO SB109 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Holsman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Holsman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to solar energy systems in certain planned communities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to solar energy systems in certain planned communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Holsman, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2017-03-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0617S.02C) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 109-Holsman |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |