MO SB109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends various provisions regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Title
Amends various provisions regarding the licensure and inspection of hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 109-Brown, with SCS |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - (0680S.04C) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 109-Brown |
2013-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled |