MO SB1081 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a procedure by which a defendant may be found to be not eligible for the death penalty due to serious mental illness

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a procedure by which a defendant may be found to be not eligible for the death penalty due to serious mental illness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateHearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2018-04-04SenateHearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee
2018-03-29SenateSecond Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2018-03-01SenateS First Read--SB 1081-Rizzo

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback