MO SB108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Hearing Conducted H Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Hearing Conducted H Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to telecommunications
Title
Creates provisions relating to telecommunications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Utilities |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred H Utilities |
2021-03-26 | House | H Second Read |
2021-03-25 | House | H First Read |
2021-03-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0476S03.02S) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Cierpiot)--(0476S.03F) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (0476S.02C) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |