MO SB108 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grants reemployment rights to members of the military
Title
Grants reemployment rights to members of the military
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 108 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Consent and House Procedure - Consent |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred H Consent and House Procedure |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans - Consent |
2017-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans - Consent |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee, with SCS - Consent |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee - Consent vote adopted (0514S.02C) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (0514S.02C) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 108-Romine |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |