MO SB1067 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Joint Committee on Missouri's Promise
Title
Creates the Joint Committee on Missouri's Promise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2010-03-01 | S First Read--SB 1067-Shields |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3407273 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1067.pdf |