MO SB1051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5050S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5050S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating earned school credit in out-of-classroom learning experiences
Title
Enacts provisions relating earned school credit in out-of-classroom learning experiences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5050S.02C) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | S First Read |