MO SB105 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the assessment percentage of real property
Title
Reduces the assessment percentage of real property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2023-02-22 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Beck)--(0684S02.02S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Schroer)--(0684S02.01S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | SS S offered (Cierpiot)--(0684S.02F) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Re-referred S General Laws Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |