MO SB104 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elections
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2015-05-06 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (0229S04.1SR) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-04 | House | H distributes CCR#2 (0229S04.1SR) |
2015-04-29 | House | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Wasson, Hegeman, Keaveny, Schupp |
2015-04-29 | House | H conferees appointed: Dugger, Entlicher, Alferman, Conway (10), Newman |
2015-04-29 | House | H grants further conference |
2015-04-28 | House | S requests H grant further conference |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | CCR S offered (0229S03.1SR) - Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | H distributes CCR (0229S03.1SR) |
2015-04-21 | House | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Wasson, Hegeman, Keaveny, Schupp |
2015-04-20 | House | H conferees appointed: Dugger, Entlicher, Alferman, Conway (10), Newman |
2015-04-20 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-04-16 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-16 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed (EC defeated) |
2015-04-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(0229H02.08H) |
2015-04-15 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(0229H02.07H) |
2015-04-15 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(0229H02.05H) |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H (hcomm) Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred H Elections Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-17 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(0229S01.01S) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 104-Kraus |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |