MO SB1011 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (6226S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (6226S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to sell at public auction property located in Oregon County by December 31, 2016
Title
Requires the Director of the Department of Natural Resources to sell at public auction property located in Oregon County by December 31, 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (6226S.03C) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1011-Cunningham and Romine |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26335657 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1011.pdf |