MO SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset on certain health care provider federal reimbursement allowances
Title
Extends the sunset on certain health care provider federal reimbursement allowances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Onder)--(0544S07.02S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Hegeman)--(0544S.07F) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-12 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Wieland)--(0544S04.08S) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | SS S offered (Hegeman)--(0544S.04F) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |